House | 05/30/2024 | Veto overrride failed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 34 | ||
House | 05/30/2024 | Veto override message received | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | Measure sent to House | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | Veto overridden: Ayes: 33 Nays: 9 | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Vetoed 04/23/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 25 | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Miller, Swope, Osburn | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 4 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Provenzano (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Dossett |