Senate | 04/24/2024 | Approved by Governor 04/23/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 4 | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 9 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 14 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Garvin |