Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1752 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2024

Amended

Bill April 15, 2024
Bill March 4, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 29, 2024