House | 04/04/2024 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Boatman (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Garvin |