House | 04/09/2024 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Chad) | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 11 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 16 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Daniels | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Moore | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Baker (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Paxton | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Kristen) |