House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Lowe (Dick) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Alvord |