Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/22/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Maynard
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Hall
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Brooks
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Gollihare
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Johns (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Remove as author Senator Garvin; authored by Senator Haste
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator McCortney
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|