Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1803 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 17, 2024

Amended

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 20, 2024