House | 03/27/2024 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Boatman (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Rosino |