Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1822 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/17/2024

                             
 
 
Req. No. 3390 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 59th Legislature (2024) 
 
SENATE BILL 1822 	By: Dahm 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to refugees; requiring the Department 
of Human Services to provide certain accounting; 
specifying information to be includ ed in accounting; 
requiring submission of certain report; providing for 
codification; and providing an effective date. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 196.1 of Title 56, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
The Department of Human Services shall provide a full accounting 
of all refugees from the nation of Afghanistan who arrived in the 
state on or after January 1, 2020.  The accounting shall include the 
name, age, and sex of each refugee, and any other individual or 
demographic information as deemed appropriate by the Director of 
Human Services.  Not later than November 1, 2025, the Department 
shall electronically submit a report summarizing and analyzing 
figures and trends of the information collected under this section   
 
 
Req. No. 3390 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
to the President Pro Tempore of the Senate, the Speaker of the House 
of Representatives, and the Governor. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2024. 
 
59-2-3390 DC 1/17/2024 4:17:42 PM