Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1854 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 23, 2024

Amended

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill February 19, 2024