House
|
05/21/2024
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
SCs named Treat, Garvin, Stewart, Hamilton, Seifried, Alvord, Young
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Swope
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Kevin)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Treat
|
|
|