Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1860 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024

Amended

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill February 19, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 2, 2024