House | 04/10/2024 | CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Burns | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Coauthored by Representative George (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Weaver |