Req. No. 2835 Page 1 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 STATE OF OKLAHOMA 2nd Session of the 59th Legislature (2024) SENATE BILL 1890 By: Murdock AS INTRODUCED An Act relating to the Sex Offenders Registration Act; amending 57 O.S. 2021, Section 582, which relates to persons and crimes to which act applies; disallowing certain agreement; disallowing removal of certain requirement; prohibiting contact with any minor; updating statutory language ; updating statutory reference; providing for codification; and providing an effective date . BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 57 O.S. 2021, Section 582, is amended to read as follows: Section 582. A. The provisions of the Sex Offenders Registration Act shall apply to any perso n residing, working or attending school within the State of Oklahoma this state who, after November 1, 1989, has been convicted, whether upon a verdict or plea of guilty or upon a plea of nolo contendere, o r received a suspended sentence or any probationar y term, or is currently serving a sentence or any form of probation or parole f or a crime or an attempt to commit a crime provided for in Section 843.5 of Title 21 of the Oklahoma Statut es if the offense involved sexual abuse or Req. No. 2835 Page 2 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 sexual exploitation as thos e terms are defined in Section 1 -1-105 of Title 10A of the Oklahoma Statut es, Section 681, if the offense involved sexual assault, 741, if the offense involved sexual abuse or sexual exploitation, Section 7 48, if the offense involved human trafficking for commercial sex, Section 843.1, if the offense involved sexual abuse or sexual e xploitation, Section 852.1, if the offense involved sex ual abuse of a child, 856, if the offense involved child prostitution or human trafficking for commercial sex, 865 et seq., 885, 886, 888, 891, if the offense involved sexual abuse or sexual explo itation, 1021, 1021.2, 1021.3, 1024. 2, 1029, if the offense involved child prostitution, 1040.8, if the offense involved child porno graphy, 1040.12a, 1040.13, 1040.13a, 1087, 1088, 1111.1, 1114 or 1123 of Title 21 of the Oklahoma Statutes. B. The provisions of the Sex Offenders Registration Act shall apply to any person who after November 1, 1989, resides, works or attends school within the State of Oklahoma this state and who has been convicted or received a suspended sentence at any time in any court of another sta te, the District of Columbia, Puerto Rico, Guam, American Samoa, the Northern Mariana Islands and the United States Virgin Islands, a federal court, an Indian tribal court , a military court, or a court of a foreign country for a crime, atte mpted crime or a conspiracy to commit a crime which, if committed or attempt ed in this state, would be a crime, an attempt to commit a crime or a Req. No. 2835 Page 3 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 conspiracy to commit a cri me provided for in any of the laws listed in subsection A of this section. C. The provisions of the Sex Offenders Registration Act shal l apply to any person who resides, works or attends school within the State of Oklahoma this state and who has received a deferred judgment at any time in any court of another state, the District of Columbia, Puerto Rico, Guam, American Samoa, the Northern Mariana Islands and the United Sta tes Virgin Islands, a federal court, an Indian tribal court, a military court, or a court of a forei gn country for a crime, attempted crime or a conspiracy to commit a crime which, if committed or attempted or conspired to be commit ted in this state, would be a crime, an attempt to commit a crime or a conspiracy to commit a crime provided for in Section 843.5 of Title 21 of the Oklahoma Statutes if the offense involved sexual abuse or sexual exploitation as those terms are defined in Section 1 -1-105 of Title 10A of the Oklahoma Statutes, Section 681, if the offense involved sexual assault, 741, if the off ense involved sexual abuse or sexual exploitation, Section 748, if the offense involved human trafficking for commercial sex, Sectio n 843.1, if the offense involved sexual abuse or sexual exploitation, Sect ion 852.1, if the offense involved sexual abuse of a child, 856, if the offense involved child prostitution or human trafficking for commercial sex, 865 et seq., 885, 886, 888, 891, if the offense involved sexual abuse or sexual exploitation, 1021, 1021.2, 1021.3, 1024.2, 1029, if Req. No. 2835 Page 4 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 the offense involved chi ld prostitution, 1040.8, if the offense involved child pornography, 1040.12a, 1040.13, 1040.13a, 1087, 1088, 1111.1, 1114 or 1123 of Title 21 of the Oklahoma Statutes. The provisions of the Sex Offenders R egistration Act shall not apply to any such person while the person is incarcerated in a maximum or medium correctional instituti on of the Department of Corrections. D. On November 1, 2002, any person regi stered as a sex offender pursuant to Section 741 of Title 21 of the Oklahoma Statutes shall be summarily removed from the Sex Offender Registry sex offender registry by the Department of Corrections and all law enforce ment agencies of any political subdi vision of this state, unless the offense involved sexual abuse or sexual exploitation. E. The provisions of the Sex Offenders Registration Act shall not apply to any such person wh o has received a crimin al history records expungement for a conviction in another state for a crime or attempted crime which, if committed or attempted in this state, would be a crime or an attempt to commit a crime provided for in any laws listed in subsection A of this section. F. The provisions of the Sex Offenders Registrati on Act shall apply to any person residing, working o r attending school within this state who, after the effective date of this act November 1, 2020, has been convicted, whether upon a verdict or plea of guilty or upon a plea of nolo contendere, or received a suspended sentence or any probationary term, or is currently serving a sentence or any Req. No. 2835 Page 5 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 form of probation or parole for a crime or an attempt to commit a crime as provided for in subsection G of Section 1040.13b of Title 21 of the Oklahoma Statutes. G. The provisions of the Sex Offenders Registration Act shall apply to any person who resides, works or a ttends school within this state and who has received a deferred judgment at any time in any court of another state, the District of Columbia, Puerto Rico, Guam, American Samoa, the Northern Maria na Islands and the United States Virgin Islands, a federal co urt, an Indian tribal court, a military court, or a court of a foreign country for a crime, if committed in this state, would be a crim e, as provided for in subsection F o f Section 1040.13b of Title 21 of t he Oklahoma Statutes. The provisions of the Sex O ffenders Registration Act shall not apply to any such person while the person i s incarcerated in a maximum or medium correctional institution in the custody of the Department of Corrections. H. Any person who has been convicted, whether upon a v erdict or plea of guilty or upon a plea of nolo contendere, or received a suspended sentence or any probationary term or parole for a crime which requires him or her to register as a sex of fender pursuant to the terms of the Sex Offenders Registration Act shall not enter into a plea agreement whereby the offender shall be allowed to forgo registering as a sex offender. Req. No. 2835 Page 6 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 I. The sealing of a criminal record or other acti on that limits the publicity or availability of conviction information shall not remove the requirement of an individual to register as a sex offender pursuant to the provisions of the S ex Offenders Registration Act. SECTION 2. NEW LAW A new section of law to be codified in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 590.3 of Title 57, unless there is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: A person required to register under the provisions of the Sex Offenders Registration Act shall not be allowed to have any contact with a person under the age of eighteen (18) years, including the child of such offender . SECTION 3. This act shall become effective November 1, 2024. 59-2-2835 CN 1/18/2024 9:08:08 AM