Senate | 05/29/2024 | Emergency added | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | Enacting clause restored | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | CCR read | ||
House | 05/20/2024 | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | SCs named Hall, Garvin, Stewart, Seifried, Weaver, Floyd | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | HAs rejected, conference requested | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Hall |