Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1903 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 11, 2024

Amended

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill February 19, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill May 29, 2024
Bill February 15, 2024