Senate | 04/23/2024 | Approved by Governor 04/22/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis, Munson | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Stephens | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Johns (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Haste |