House | 03/26/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Sneed (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Bullard |