Senate | 05/20/2024 | Approved by Governor 05/20/2024 | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
House | 05/16/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | HAs adopted | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Rosino |