Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1920 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 16, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2024

Amended

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill February 27, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 26, 2024