House | 04/02/2024 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 9 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Ford (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Haste |