Senate | 04/26/2024 | Approved by Governor 04/26/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 12 | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Cantrell (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Kidd |