Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/20/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Paxton
|
|
|