Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1943 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2024
Bill March 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2024

Amended

Bill April 15, 2024
Bill February 13, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2024
Bill February 12, 2024