House | 04/01/2024 | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Cantrell (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Stewart |