Senate | 04/26/2024 | Approved by Governor 04/26/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/24/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Howard |