Senate | 04/23/2024 | Approved by Governor 04/22/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 20 | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 3 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Hays (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Coleman |