Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB2001 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 17, 2024

Amended

Bill April 11, 2024
Bill February 27, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 26, 2024