Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/30/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Menz
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Bashore
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Treat
|
|
|