Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB2035 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2024
Bill March 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 30, 2024

Amended

Bill April 5, 2024
Bill February 28, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 3, 2024