Senate | 03/22/2023 | Measure failed: Ayes: 14 Nays: 33 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Daniels | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |