House
|
05/28/2024
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Business and Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
SCs named Garvin, Rosino, Haste, Deevers, Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Remove as author Senator Seifried; authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 29; Ayes: 62 Nays: 29
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Garvin
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Remove Senator Garvin as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Seifried
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|