Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB232 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 12, 2024

Amended

Bill April 10, 2024
Bill March 4, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 10, 2024
Bill February 29, 2024