Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
SCs named Garvin, Coleman, Paxton, Daniels, Burns, Young
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Davis
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|