Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB264 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 14, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2023