Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
Pocket veto 06/11/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Pemberton, Pugh, Seifried, Rader, Murdock, Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Wolfley
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Luttrell (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|