Senate | 04/28/2023 | Approved by Governor 04/28/2023 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Roe (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Stanley |