Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB325 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2024
Bill March 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2024

Amended

Bill April 10, 2024
Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 10, 2024
Bill February 20, 2024