House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Manger (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Stanley |