Senate | 04/18/2023 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Kendrix (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |