Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB337 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 5, 2023