House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Wildlife | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Emergency removed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Murdock |