Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB354 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill February 9, 2023