House
|
04/12/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Williams
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization and Technology Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Government Modernization and Technology
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Seifried
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Hasenbeck (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|