House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 7 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Sneed (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Daniels |