House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 20 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Hasenbeck (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Garvin |