Senate | 05/28/2024 | Vetoed 05/28/2024 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 6 | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | HAs adopted | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 13 | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Remove Representative Roe as principal House author and substitute with Representative George | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Roe (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Pugh |