Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB423 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill February 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2024

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023