Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Approved by Governor 06/05/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 36 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Elections and Ethics
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
SCs named Burns, Rosino, Howard, Rader, Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Standridge
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Humphrey
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Staires
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Stark
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Prieto
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Dahm
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Deevers
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 21
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Jett, Hamilton
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Williams, Gann, Steagall, Boles, Maynard, CrosswhiteHader, West (Kevin), Hays, Sims
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Rick) (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Burns
|
|
|